Webb18 jan. 2016 · The chief executive of Wolseley, the UK building materials merchant, has announced plans to retire. Ian Meakins will leave in August after a seven-year stint at the helm of the company, which is ... WebbMr Ian Meakins. Non-Executive Chairman. Mr John Bryant. Non-Executive Director. Mr Nelson L C Silva. Non ... 21/11/2024 07:14:17 Compass revenues more than double in Q3 26/07/2024 07:09:46 RBC Capital Markets raises target price on Compass Group 25/05/2024 08:59:00 Compass upgrades revenue outlook as H1 profits surge …
Director/PDMR Shareholding – Company Announcement - FT.com
WebbAt Rexel, Ian Meakins has 128 colleagues including Guillaume Texier (CEO), Agnes Touraine (Director) …. At Compass Group, Ian Meakins has 170 colleagues including … Webb24 feb. 2024 · Chaired by Ian Meakins, the Rexel Board of Directors has twelve members, 80% of whom are independent Directors. To deliver its mission effectively and facilitate decision making, it is assisted by three specialized Committees: the Audit and Risk Committee, the Nomination Committee and the Compensation Committee. 80% ヴェルニー記念館
Compass Group appoints Ian Meakins as new chairman - Restaurant
WebbIAN MEAKINS Chairman of the Board DEAR SHAREHOLDER, When I assumed the role of the Chairman of Compass in December 2024, the Group was experiencing one of … WebbCompass Group PLC (the "Company") announces the following changes in the interests of Directors and Persons Discharging Managerial Responsibility ("PDMR") in ordinary shares of 11 1/20 pence each in the share capital of the Company ("Shares"). On 25 November 2024, Mrs Serrie Meakins, a person closely associated with Mr Ian Meakins, a WebbIan Meakins was appointed to the Board on 1 September 2024 and succeeded Paul Walsh as Chairman of the Board on 1 December 2024. Ian is an experienced Chairman and … ヴェルニゲローデ